ANGELS FOR ANIMALS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are dedicated to improving the quality of life for street dogs in Turkey, empowering the local volunteers that help us to improve the quality of life for street dogs in Turkey and rescuing and rehoming dogs with loving families. We rescue and rehome vulnerable dogs and we make grants to local volunteers in Turkey to care for and reduce the the street dog population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Aruba
- Bulgaria
- China
- Cyprus
- Greece
- Guatemala
- India
- Morocco
- Oman
- Romania
- Serbia
- South Korea
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Victoria Harrison | Chair | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SKYE EMILY WARDLE | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Grace Harrison | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Helen Lavercombe | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Holland | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.34k | £109.33k | £91.00k | £53.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.68k | £104.16k | £89.04k | £59.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND ABROAD BY THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN COMPASSION TOWARDS ANIMALS, THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS FROM CRUELTY, AND THE RELIEF OF ANIMAL SUFFERING THROUGH: A. FORMING PARTNERSHIPS WITH ANIMAL AND WILDLIFE RESCUE, REHABILITATION AND ADOPTION ORGANISATION’S AND VOLUNTEERS GLOBALLY, PROVIDING THEM WITH FUNDING (BY WAY OF GRANTS), INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THEIR PROJECTS; B. TAKING FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY AND OVERALL RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE CARE OF ANIMALS RESCUED BY PARTNER ANIMAL AND WILDLIFE RESCUE ORGANISATION’S AND VOLUNTEERS ABROAD AND REHOMING THESE ANIMALS WITH APPROPRIATE FAMILIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND C. RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING EDUCATION AROUND GLOBAL STRAY, ABANDONED AND ABUSED ANIMAL WELFARE CONCERNS ABROAD AND WORKING WITH COMMUNITIES TO ADDRESS THESE CONCERNS IN A WAY THAT IS MUTUALLY BENEFICIAL FOR THE ANIMAL AND HUMAN POPULATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Bradburys
Launton Road
Stratton Audley
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX27 9AS
- Phone:
- 07595937825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window