CHESTER FOLK FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education in, and appreciation of British and Multicultural Folk Arts (including traditional and contemporary folk music, dance, crafts and spoken word such as poetry and storytelling) in Chester and surrounding area through the staging of an annual folk festival and the provision of a range of participatory workshops, activities and other events throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 08 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Armstrong FCA/CTA | Chair | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Cheryl Hunt | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jonathan Thompson | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £38.41k | £51.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £40.61k | £51.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF BRITISH AND MULTICULTURAL FOLK ARTS (INCLUDING TRADITIONAL AND CONTEMPORARY FOLK MUSIC, DANCE, CRAFTS AND SPOKEN WORD SUCH AS POETRY AND STORYTELLING) IN CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE STAGING OF AN ANNUAL FOLK FESTIVAL AND THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF PARTICIPATORY WORKSHOPS, ACTIVITIES AND OTHER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 DEE FORDS AVENUE
CHESTER
CH3 5UP
- Phone:
- 08712180211
- Email:
- info@chesterfolk.org.uk
- Website:
-
chesterfolk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window