FLAMBOROUGH BIRD OBSERVATORY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1190421
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monitoring of bird populations and publishing the results, providing opportunities to witness and learn about bird migration, providing access to facilities and land to the general public for the study and enjoyment of the natural world, managing natural habitat to the benefit of birds and other wildlife.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £13,450
Total expenditure: £9,446

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CRAIG THOMAS Chair 01 July 2020
None on record
John McLoughlin Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Rob Little Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £22.82k £15.65k £13.45k
Total expenditure £1.90k £13.73k £9.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 July 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RED BRICKS
SOUTH SEA ROAD
FLAMBOROUGH
BRIDLINGTON
YO15 1AE
Phone:
07954411422
Website:

flamboroughbirdobs.org.uk