GRUNDISBURGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 August 2020: CIO registration
- 21 April 2023: Funds received from 304754 GRUNDISBURGH VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYAN LAXTON | Chair | 03 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Julian Oliver Brook | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Silk | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stewart | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tatham | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Seabrook | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Edward John Keates | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol McConnell-Theobald | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Nicholas Ellerby | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £43.60k | £54.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £32.99k | £22.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GRUNDISBURGH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A)MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B)OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grundisburgh Village Hall
Ipswich Road
Grundisburgh
Suffolk
IP13 6US
- Phone:
- 07434641253
- Email:
- info@gnvh.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window