Financial history STONEBROOM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 516459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.47k £19.69k £17.95k £10.36k £14.11k
Total expenditure £17.64k £3.31k £8.05k £13.16k £29.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £19.67k £10.67k N/A £4.13k