STONEBROOM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote benefit of the inhabitants of the Ecclesiastical Parish of St Peter Stonebroom and the neighbourbood by the advancement of education and the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,130 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 10 May 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johnathon Stephen Walmsley | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Kevan Mulliss | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Marie Mulliss | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ian Smith | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Else | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Rhodes | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joy Keeton | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Cresswell | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cliff Whitehead | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kath Adams | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
LIZ BROWN | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN BARRATT | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.47k | £19.69k | £17.95k | £10.36k | £14.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.64k | £3.31k | £8.05k | £13.16k | £29.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £19.67k | £10.67k | N/A | £4.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER STONEBROOM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Priestley Avenue
Stretton
ALFRETON
Derbyshire
DE55 6FX
- Phone:
- 07853228089
- Email:
- joykeeton1954@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window