Trustees STONEBROOM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 516459

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johnathon Stephen Walmsley | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Kevan Mulliss | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Marie Mulliss | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ian Smith | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Else | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Rhodes | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joy Keeton | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Cresswell | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cliff Whitehead | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kath Adams | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
LIZ BROWN | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN BARRATT | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.