FOX AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur boxing club - providing boxing and fitness classes to the local community. The organisation supports people from the community in the following ways; increased access to physical activity which supports individuals health and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Oldham
Governance
- 02 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Senior | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Alexander OBrien | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Lee Crolla | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.68k | £52.75k | £44.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.03k | £55.63k | £46.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FAILSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF NORTH MANCHESTER, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY USING BOXING AND ITS TRAINING AND TECHNIQUES AS A MEANS OF IMPROVING HEALTH AND FITNESS AND ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO MAKE HEALTHY LIFE CHOICES. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FAILSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF NORTH MANCHESTER, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vestacare Stadium
Whitebank Road
OLDHAM
OL8 3JH
- Phone:
- 07809253145
- Email:
- foxabcmanchester@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window