FORWARD MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life and relieve the needs of young people by providing support and activities focused on the preforming arts, media and entertainment production to hep develop their skills, capabilities and to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 15 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cleveland Fletcher | Chair | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mikael Braddy | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Bailey | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 322 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES FOCUSED ON THE PERFORMING ARTS, MEDIA AND ENTERTAINMENT PRODUCTION TO HELP DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
240
Rocky lane
Perrybarr
Birmingham
B42 1QX
- Phone:
- 01213776600
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window