THE MARION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND THEIR CARERS RESIDENT IN NORWICH, IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CARE AND DEMENTIA CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY PROVIDING TRANSPORT, ACTIVITIES, SERVICES, TOGETHER WITH SUPPORT FOR THEIR CARERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 October 2020: CIO registration
- 28 December 2023: Funds received from 292043 MARION ROAD CENTRE TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Jacqueline Middleton | Chair | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE WHITAKER | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN MARGARET MONEY | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £417.64k | £16.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.24k | £25.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND THEIR CARERS RESIDENT IN NORWICH, IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CARE AND DEMENTIA CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY PROVIDING TRANSPORT, ACTIVITIES, SERVICES, MEALS AND REFRESHMENTS TOGETHER WITH SUPPORT FOR THEIR CARERS, INCLUDING TRAINING, RESPITE CARE AND ACCESS TO SUPPORT GROUPS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Part First Floor
West Wing
69-75 Thorpe Road
NORWICH
- Phone:
- 01603666711
- Email:
- jaymid@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window