THE CHAND FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support people in Bangladesh in reducing household poverty through: Education, skills training, Healthcare, Nutrition, income generation projects, Sanitations, clean water projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 10 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Formuz Ali | Chair | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monshur Ali | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Afsar Ali | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £19.49k | £18.87k | £14.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £17.74k | £15.26k | £14.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO MEET AND RELIEVE THEIR CHARITABLE NEEDS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 REYNOLDS HOUSE
APPROACH ROAD
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07939458320
- Email:
- thechandfoundation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window