STEPS AHEAD LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping young children advance in their education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 02 October 2020: Standard registration
- STEPS AHEAD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Steinmetz | Chair | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN GOLDBERG | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simcha Schloss | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.25k | £67.22k | £55.29k | £52.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.73k | £62.58k | £78.82k | £51.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AGED 3 - 16 EXPERIENCING LEARNING, BEHAVIOURAL, EMOTIONAL, LATE DEVELOPMENTAL AND OTHER DIFFICULTIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A. FACILITIES, RESOURCES AND THERAPIES IN A SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT AS AN ADDITION TO THEIR DAILY SCHOOL EXPERIENCE B. GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS ADDITIONAL RESOURCES BEYOND WHAT THE CHARITY CAN PROVIDE C. TRAINING, BOTH FORMAL AND INFORMAL, TO LEARNING SUPPORT ASSISTANTS OF SUCH CHILDREN TO INCREASE THEIR SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND THE QUALITY OF THEIR SUPPORT TO SUCH CHILDREN D. PARENTING ADVICE AND OTHER RELEVANT TOOLS TO PARENTS AND CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN IN HOW TO BEST MANAGE THEIR CHILDREN'S BEHAVIOUR IN THEIR HOME ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 OLINDA ROAD
LONDON
N16 6TR
- Phone:
- 02088060898
- Email:
- stepsahead.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window