MUSLIM FUTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working internationally to support the needy and vulnerable, sick, disabled, widowed and orphaned. We alleviate poverty and hardship, by improving access to essential life-critical services, personal development and self-empowerment. Our areas of work include: Education & Literacy. Children & Youth. Widows & Orphans. Sick & Disabled. Vulnerable & Homeless. Skills & Training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
Governance
- 19 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ummar Yousaf | Chair | 01 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
Salma Bibi Haq | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Freeda Yousaf | Trustee | 01 August 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.67k | £151.93k | £108.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.84k | £130.19k | £95.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, RELIEVE SICKNESS, OR ADVANCE EDUCATION. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, THE CHARITY SHALL BE INSPIRED BY THE TEACHINGS OF ISLAM, AND GUIDED BY THE UNIVERSAL VALUES OF EMPATHY, GENEROSITY AND SELFLESSNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
570 CRANBROOK ROAD
ILFORD
(BY APPOINTMENT ONLY)
IG2 6RE
- Phone:
- 07534 608 600
- Email:
- info@muslimfutures.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window