Accounts and annual returns ROSSENDALE SPECIAL SKI CLUB

Charity Number: 1191959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 June 2024 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 June 2024 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window