ROSSENDALE SPECIAL SKI CLUB

Charity Number: 1191959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide and promote safe and enjoyable opportunities for individuals with an intellectual disability to be able to learn,participate ,experience and compete in Alpine Skiing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £30,079
Total expenditure: £32,264

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Vaughan Chair 23 October 2020
None on record
Stuart Armstrong-Marshall Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Susan Fearon Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record
Alison Wild Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record
Alison de Vial Mrs Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.52k £31.46k £30.08k
Total expenditure £10.08k £27.51k £32.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 June 2024 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 June 2024 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHERFIN HOUSE
SHERFIN NOOK
Accrington
BB5 2DT
Phone:
07931854130
Website:

rosski.org.uk