COCKERMOUTH MECHANICS BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non competing Brass Band based in Cockermouth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Hunter | Chair | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luke Jones | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Goodwin | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Mansfield | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter MacGibbon | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Roy Skillen | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Moore | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Smith | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE DAVID BARNARD | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.05k | £7.69k | £8.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.19k | £7.08k | £6.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR MUSIC PRESENTED BY BRASS BANDS, BY MEANS OF REHEARSALS AND CONCERTS AND OTHER MUSICAL ACTIVITIES WHICH THE PUBLIC WILL HAVE ACCESS TO AND BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE TO LEARN TO PLAY A BRASS INSTRUMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pack Horse Cottage
Low Lorton
COCKERMOUTH
Cumbria
CA13 9UW
- Phone:
- 07920703775
- Email:
- clivedbarnard@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window