PRIME DIAMOND INITIATIVE FOR COMMUNITY HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The preservation and protection of good physical and mental health and wellbeing by: The provision of seminars, workshops, public awareness campaigns, opportunities to participate in physical exercise, information, counselling, signposting services and support. 2. The relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
Governance
- 01 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAITH OSANNA VICTORIOUS | Chair | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA OKEMENA UNUFE | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maame Efua Enyama Tete | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chinasa Onukegbe | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.97k | £0 | £3.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.70k | £270 | £3.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2024 | 577 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2024 | 577 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, WHICH ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND NIGERIA ARE: 1. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING BY: A) THE PROVISION OF SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS, PUBLIC AWARENESS CAMPAIGNS, OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN PHYSICAL EXERCISE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING, SIGNPOSTING SERVICES AND SUPPORT. B) SPONSORING RESEARCH INTO ASPECTS OF MENSTRUAL HEALTH AND CANCER RISK FACTORS, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 George Mews
LONDON
NW1 2EU
- Phone:
- 07811044540
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window