HEREFORDSHIRE VETERANS SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. PROVIDING A SINGLE POINT OF CONTACT TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, PRACTICAL SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO RELIEVE A VETERANS DISTRESS, ILLNESS OR HARDSHIP. 2. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING VETERANS WELLBEING, SELF
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 04 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Lewis | Chair | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Collyer | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Kearney | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Desmond Guest | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Mary Dearden | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Bridgewater | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kaye | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Leavy | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Tipping | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Richard Chandler | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.22k | £64.57k | £27.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.95k | £52.94k | £38.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH, WELLBEING AND RESETTLEMENT INTO THE COMMUNITY OF ANY AND ALL EX H.M. ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL, EX H.M. ARMED FORCES RESERVISTS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE MERCHANT NAVY WHO HAVE SERVED ALONGSIDE THEIR ARMED FORCES COMRADES DURING A CONFLICT (ALSO REFERRED TO AS VETERANS) ALONG WITH THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS WHO RESIDE IN HEREFORDSHIRE OR THE SURROUNDING AREA AND WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR ARE IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, WHO ARE EXPERIENCING DIFFICULTIES ADJUSTING TO POST SERVICE CIVILIAN LIFE, ARE EXPERIENCING HARDSHIP, UNEMPLOYMENT OR HOMELESSNESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY THINK FIT BY; 1. PROVIDING A SINGLE POINT OF CONTACT TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, PRACTICAL SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO RELIEVE A VETERANS DISTRESS, ILLNESS OR HARDSHIP. 2. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING VETERANS WELLBEING, SELF-ESTEEM, SELF-CONFIDENCE AND AIDING THEIR TRANSITION BACK INTO LOCAL SOCIETY. 3. PROVIDING OR ARRANGING PROVISION OF EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL SKILLS TRAINING OR OTHER ASSISTANCE AND TO CREATE AND FACILITATE JOB OPPORTUNITIES ALONG WITH ASSISTING HM ARMED FORCES VETERANS TO PREPARE FOR AND FIND EMPLOYMENT. 4. OPERATE A DROP IN AND ACTIVITY CENTRE STAFFED BY VOLUNTEERS, HM ARMED FORCES VETERANS TO PROVIDE ADVICE, EMPATHY, SUPPORT AND A SIGN POSTING SERVICE TO HELP HM ARMED FORCES VETERANS WHO ARE EXPERIENCING PROBLEMS DUE TO ONE OF THE ABOVE CHALLENGES AND TO ASSIST THEM ACCESS LOCAL SERVICE PROVIDERS AND SUPPORT ORGANISATIONS THAT MAY BE ABLE TO PROVIDE HELP OR SUPPORT. 5. DO ALL SUCH LAWFUL THINGS THAT MAY FURTHER THE CHARITIES OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HVS Centre
100 Widemarsh Street
HEREFORD
HR4 9HG
- Phone:
- 01432 674853
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window