Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH (NEW UNITY) MANGER OF JESUS CHRIST PARISH

Charity number: 1190872
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 February 2025 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 February 2025 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 June 2024 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 June 2024 126 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 June 2024 491 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 June 2024 491 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window