ZERO CARBON GUILDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the public benefit the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment in particular but not exclusively by: (a) supporting strategies and methods of reduction, mitigation and adaptation in response to climate change; (b) educating the public in the causes, impact, mitigation of and adaptation to climate change and related issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
222 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Delilah James Carpenter-Lomax | Chair | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Nicholas White | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Harris | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROL DUNNETT | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Donald Cook | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Clowser | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Lesley Evans | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prashant Kumar | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Francesca Robson | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen John Davis | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Mariam Lewis | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Robin Stokes | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.50k | £112.31k | £130.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.36k | £85.30k | £90.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | £3.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) SUPPORTING STRATEGIES AND METHODS OF REDUCTION, MITIGATION AND ADAPTATION IN RESPONSE TO CLIMATE CHANGE; B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES, IMPACT, MITIGATION OF AND ADAPTATION TO CLIMATE CHANGE AND RELATED ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 BROAD STREET
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU3 3BG
- Phone:
- 03001233033
- Email:
- info@zerocarbonguildford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window