Trustees ZERO CARBON GUILDFORD

Charity number: 1192880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Olivia Delilah James Carpenter-Lomax Chair 19 August 2020
None on record
Jack Nicholas White Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Helen Louise Harris Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
CAROL DUNNETT Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Stuart Donald Cook Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Katherine Clowser Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Dr Patricia Lesley Evans Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Prashant Kumar Trustee 18 June 2022
None on record
Isabel Francesca Robson Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Dr Stephen John Davis Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Kerry Mariam Lewis Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
David Robin Stokes Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record