WICKENS FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation is a grant making charity. Its grant making activity will primarily focus on making grants to charities registered with the Charity Commission for England and Wales for the purposes of assisting disadvantaged young people and adults (both in the UK and worldwide).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Foster Wickens | Chair | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Foster Wickens | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dawn Foster Wickens | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.11k | £236.11k | £236.11k | £236.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.85k | £214.42k | £181.00k | £216.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ("OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farr House
4 New Park Road
Chichester
PO19 7XA
- Phone:
- 01243836666
- Email:
- sarah@wffoundation.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window