SALTO ARTS PRODUCTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Salto Arts Productions is set up to carry out creative projects with communities primarily in the North East of England. Our focus is carnival, particularly Whitley Bay's annual event in May each year. We work with artists from throughout the region, the rest of the UK and abroad. We aim to make it meaningful, working with people to develop projects which celebrate them and their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government contract(s) and £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN DEBNAM | Chair | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Coleman Macha | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Pauline Coleman-Ware | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Fiona Robson | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Ford | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew O'Sullivan | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elliot George Thomson | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Creswick | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kennedy | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.68k | £100.33k | £121.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.91k | £140.46k | £127.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £44.50k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE BUT NOT LIMITED TO CARNIVAL AND PARTICIPATORY ARTS MAINLY IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY A. PROMOTING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS OF THE ROLES PLAYED BY ARTS CULTURE AND HERITAGE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO CARNIVAL AND PARTICIPATORY ARTS IN THE PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE OF THE NORTH-EAST REGION. B. PROVIDING TRAINING VIA CARNIVAL CLUBS IN SPECIFIC SKILLS RELATING TO CARNIVAL ARTS. C. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LOCAL PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN ARTS, CULTURAL AND HERITAGE ACTIVITIES THROUGH INVOLVEMENT IN PREPARATION FOR AND PERFORMANCE OF CARNIVALS, STREET PARADES, OPEN AIR PERFORMANCE AND OTHER PUBLIC EVENTS. D. PROMOTING CARNIVAL ARTS AND OTHER PARTICIPATORY ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 WINDSOR CRESCENT
WHITLEY BAY
NE26 2PA
- Phone:
- 07958926546
- Email:
- brodsalto@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window