Accounts and annual returns ACE SMA

Charity Number: 1191179
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 October 2024 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 October 2024 125 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 March 2024 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 March 2024 301 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 January 2024 587 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 08 January 2024 587 days late Download Open in new window