ACE SMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to fund research for the improvement to the lives of children living with Spinal Muscular Atrophy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alexander Howes | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Helen Wheatley-Hubbard M.A. | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Rachel Guest | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Alexandra Elizabeth O'Hora Banks | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Christine Caroline Romjke Howes | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Charles Llewelyn Williams | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.24k | £173.21k | £29.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11k | £35.82k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 301 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 January 2024 | 587 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 January 2024 | 587 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE RELIEF AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WITH SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY; (B) THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE, TREATMENT AND POSSIBLE PREVENTION OF SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THAT RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEBE COTTAGE
SUTTON MANDEVILLE
SALISBURY
SP3 5NA
- Phone:
- 07947368790
- Email:
- Mike@hp1t.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window