NETWORK OF INTERNATIONAL WOMEN FOR BRIGHTON AND HOVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit among women and their families whose first language is not English who are socially excluded on the grounds of their social and economic position by providing: education and training in English language and vocational skills and social and recreational facilities and events involving the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 22 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Ann Beanlands M.A. | Chair | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Crush | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Valli | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lizzie Reading | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Synne Dyvik | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laila Rashdan | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Sharp | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Renuka Chandraker | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Elizabeth Maxwell | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Mary Howell | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.30k | £54.77k | £53.65k | £114.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.87k | £16.88k | £53.41k | £68.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.25k | £10.46k | £29.71k | £22.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG WOMEN AND THEIR FAMILIES WHOSE FIRST LANGUAGE IS NOT ENGLISH WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING: 1.EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND IN VOCATIONAL SKILLS; AND 2.SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Network of International Women
Community Base
113 Queens Road
Brighton
BN1 3XG
- Phone:
- 07341840997
- Email:
- info@niwbh.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window