ONENATURE - COMMONWEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds through securing grants and raising funds from public to support sustainable agriculture projects that build sustainable, climate resilient communities while increasing biodiversity and protecting the environment across the Commonwealth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 05 January 2021: CIO registration
- ONC Registered Charity (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ishak Nadeem | Chair | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Peters | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monica Atwal | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SIPPITT | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £800 | |
|
Total expenditure | £244 | £374 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 01 September 2023 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLARKS LEGAL LLP
THAMES TOWER
STATION ROAD
READING
RG1 1LX
- Phone:
- 07786254379
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window