Accounts and annual returns STREAMS OF JOY INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1191101
Charity reporting is up to date (155 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 02 February 2025 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 02 February 2025 155 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 05 March 2024 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 05 March 2024 187 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window