Trustees AOUK & I

Charity number: 1190596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pauline Johnston Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
Sorrel Langley-Hobbs Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
Susan Deakin Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Iain Anthony McFadyen Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Ian Sharp Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Professor John Francis Quinlan Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Professor Ian Pallister Trustee 28 July 2020
None on record