SHROPSHIRE CHARITY CONCERTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shrewsbury Charity Concerts is the umbrella organisation for Shrewsbury School Community Choir. We mount regular choral concerts in the Shrewsbury area, and promote interest in classical music in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 September 2020: CIO registration
- 18 May 2023: Funds received from 1128247 SHROPSHIRE CHARITY CONCERTS
- SHREWSBURY SCHOOL COMMUNITY CHOIR (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Richard Bisson | Chair | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Brown | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Christina Turpin | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Antony Locke | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Margaret Anderton-Huang | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Therese Barratt | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Kathryn Anastasia Evans | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michele Edwards-Clark | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gretchen Christman-Johnson | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Norman Davies | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.27k | £21.78k | £23.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £452 | £22.83k | £24.56k | £19.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1. THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC ERFORMANCE. 3.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSIC AND OTHER PERFORMING ARTS THROUGH PUBLIC PERFORMANCE IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS. 3.3. TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ENTERPRISES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Marshwall
Ryton
Dorrington
SHREWSBURY
SY5 7LT
- Phone:
- 07971 092569
- Email:
- chairsscc24@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window