MORETON MORRELL TENNIS COURT CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of Real Tennis in the Midlands of England. To conserve,preserve and improve for the public benefit as a building of historic interest the Real Tennis Court at Moreton Morrell, Warwickshire CV35 9AL , and to educate the public about the history and heritage of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Hobson | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Franklin | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Peter Branfield | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Marguerie | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Philip Trees BSc | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Barry Walsh FCA | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Timothy Paxton | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sir Andrew Caradoc Hamilton BT | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £376.97k | £158.47k | £115.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.73k | £120.75k | £124.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2024 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2024 | 315 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF REAL TENNIS IN THE MIDLANDS OF ENGLAND. 2. TO CONSERVE, PRESERVE AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC INTEREST THE REAL TENNIS COURT AT MORETON MORRELL, WARWICKSHIRE CV35 9AL, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE BUILDING.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MORETON MORRELL TENNIS CLUB
MORETON MORRELL
WARWICK
CV35 9AL
- Phone:
- 01926651229
- Email:
- pro@mmtcc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window