BUILD A BRIDGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides grants, items and services to individuals in need and or charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve the needs that arise as a consequence of homelessness,child poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 01 April 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandeep Binning | Chair | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vincenzo Spano | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Theori | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antonis Theori | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.44k | £13.49k | £19.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83 | £20.59k | £13.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 25 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 OCT 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF CHILD POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE CHILD POVERTY. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF THE NEEDS THAT ARISE AS A CONSEQUENCE OF HOMELESSNESS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE THE NEEDS THAT ARISE AS A CONSEQUENCE OF HOMELESSNESS. 3. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS. 4. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
135 BALLARDS LANE
LONDON
N3 1LJ
- Phone:
- 02038677477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window