ANELES DREAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Help Family in Need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024

Total income: £2
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Moldova

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rodica Burca Female Chair 20 July 2020
None on record
Ion Burca Mr Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
ANDREI FANA Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £701 £64 £2
Total expenditure £615 £72 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 05 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2023 20 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 08 November 2024 276 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2022 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 11 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
143 Dalefield Road
west yorkshire
Normanton
WF61PN
Phone:
07555326124