INDEPENDENT CHILDREN AND FAMILIES SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a social welfare benefits charity that helps the most vulnerable members of the West Yorkshire and West Midlands community to help them to address their economic needs. This will will mean we engage with the community to provide welfare benefits advice and refer the appropriate members of the community to seek professional financial advice concerning any debts they may have.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £62,435 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammmed Arshad | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shahid | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Javid Akhtar | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Akhtar | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.11k | £111.31k | £181.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.49k | £144.57k | £146.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £80.81k | £87.32k | £62.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACCESS TO FREE FINANCIAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE WITH DEBT-RELATED PROBLEMS LIVING IN WEST YORSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA AND BEYOND WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH SUPPORT AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Lane Centre
Park Lane
BRADFORD
BD5 0LN
- Phone:
- 01274315901
- Email:
- MOHAMMED@ICAFS.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window