THE POTTER'S HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP HOUNSLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church arranges or participates in a number of activities to this end, namely Bible Conferences, Marriage Seminars, Men's Discipleships, Revival Meetings with visiting preachers, Tent Crusades (home and abroad).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
Governance
- 26 October 2020: CIO registration
- POTTER'S HOUSE HOUNSLOW (Working name)
- THE POTTER'S HOUSE CHURCH HOUNSLOW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madi Camara | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ethan Tatenda Mutero | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Asner Charles Linguissi Tonha | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Whitmond Hetcourt Short | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.62k | £153.14k | £106.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.07k | £156.33k | £110.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 4.3 SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 St. Marys Drive
FELTHAM
Middlesex
TW14 8JT
- Phone:
- 07533 123964
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window