WSHA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Wsha Kurdish Supplementary School, we are a charity aiming to educate our community and pass on Kurdish culture, history and language to future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Iraq
Governance
- 22 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Salih | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Titi Adeyemo | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Snur Saeed | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.16k | £17.00k | £14.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.99k | £16.00k | £13.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE KURDISH PEOPLE IN THE UK EITHER SEEKING ASYLUM OR GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS OR WHO ARE MIGRANTS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS: - TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND TRAINING PARTICULARLY SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY - THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE - TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH - THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND - TO PROMOTE ANY FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE KURDISH SPEAKING COMMUNITY IN THE UK AS THE TRSUTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE (WITH PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THE LONDON AREA) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF KURDISH PEOPLE IN IRAQ.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7
Thorpe Close
Kensington
W10 5LX
- Phone:
- 07842395774
- Email:
- sozafrj@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window