NORTH WALSHAM PHOENIX GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in North Walsham in need by reason of youth, age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, either generally or individually through the provision of grants, goods or services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
Total income includes £111,921 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saul Penfold | Chair | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Eastwick | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Shires | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|||||
ROBERT WRIGHT | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.84k | £80.83k | £122.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.60k | £7.53k | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £111.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 26 January 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 26 January 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
“THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGHOUT NORFOLK EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES”.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 MARKET PLACE
NORTH WALSHAM
NR28 9BP
- Phone:
- 07593285517
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window