NASARA TELFORD GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. We promote for the benefit of the Telford inhabitant, other places and the local authorities to advance education and provide facilities in the interest of social welfare and leisure to the inhabitants 2. We intend to provides a secure esblishment of a comunity centre and a recreational facilities to maintain and manage by the organisation and the local authority in furtherance of our objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government contract(s) and £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALIM KARIMDEEN | Chair | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Awulatu Iddrisu Ayang | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ceridwyn Louise Waja | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mudasir Saeed Sagna | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Salamatu Muntari | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Nasser Seidu Adamu | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Suleiman | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHAMBAS-AMIN HASSANE | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £16.79k | £36.03k | £24.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £4.05k | £11.78k | £14.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.34k | £1.84k | £500 | |
|
Income from government grants | £756 | £2.34k | £1.84k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 371 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2024 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2024 | 730 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TELFORD BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36
REES WAY
LAWLEY VILLAGE
TELFORD
SHRIOPSHIRE
TF4 2GN
- Phone:
- 07740877107
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window