Trustees BRITISH ELBOW & SHOULDER SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1191220

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joideep Phadnis | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|||||
AMOL ASHOK TAMBE | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harvinder Pal Singh | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nashat Siddiqui | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aparna Viswanath | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Winton | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Adam Watts | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Bhalaik | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ananth Ebinesan | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jenkins | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Drew | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jonathan Rees | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.