THE ELPIS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Elpis Project is advancing education in the field of conflict resolution and entrepreneurship for members of the public coming from the traditionally opposed cultures and backgrounds of Palestine and Israel.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faris Fakhry | Chair | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Nathan | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RECONCILIATION AND HARMONY BETWEEN THE PEOPLE OF PALESTINE AND ISRAEL WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES BY: A. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF YOUNG PERSONS FROM PALESTINE AND ISRAEL IN EACH OTHER’S HISTORY, POLITICS AND CULTURE B. ADVANCING EDUCATION IN ENTREPRENEURSHIP WITH A VIEW TO INITIATING AND SUPPORTING PROJECTS AIMED AT TRUST BUILDING, CONCILIATION AND COOPERATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
E S O CAPITAL PARTNERS UK LLP
PALLADIUM HOUSE
1-4 ARGYLL STREET
LONDON
W1F 7TA
- Phone:
- +447831721293
- Email:
- info@elpisproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window