DANDELION DISABILITY EVENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Dandelion Disability Events, we aim to provide a safe space in which individuals with learning and/or physical disabilities can attend themed events. Events are themed due to the time of year each event is held, for instance - An event held in December will have a Christmas theme. All events will differ from the previous and venues will change accordingly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeff Gillaspy | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £369 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £49 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 27 May 2023 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 26 November 2022 | 298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND SUPPORT PERSONS WITH LEARNING AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES BY PROVIDING SAID PERSONS WITH ACCESS TO FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS WHICH ARE APPROPRIATELY TAILORED TO ADDRESS THE NEEDS OF SAID PERSONS AND ENABLE THEM TO BUILD CONFIDENCE AND SOCIALISE AND IN A SAFE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79A St. James Street
PENZANCE
Cornwall
TR18 2BT
- Phone:
- 07711983536
- Website:
-
Www.dandeliondisabilityevents.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window