STRIVE 2 HELP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY THE PROVISION OF; AWARDING GRANTS TO AID POVERTY REDUCTION PROGRAMMES ASSISTING IN THE CREATION OF CLEAN WATER WELLS AND IMPROVED SANITATION ASSISTING IN INCREASING FOOD DISTRIBUTION TO POOR AREAS AND LOW-INCOME FAMILIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Yemen
Governance
- 21 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmed Al-Asbahy | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Al-Yafai | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Khaled Abdulla Abdulrab | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/07/2021 | 20/07/2022 | 20/07/2023 | 20/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.33k | £26.69k | £23.20k | £43.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £8.14k | £46.04k | £60.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 July 2022 | 23 September 2023 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 July 2022 | 23 September 2023 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 July 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 July 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY THE PROVISION OF; AWARDING GRANTS TO AID POVERTY REDUCTION PROGRAMMES ASSISTING IN THE CREATION OF CLEAN WATER WELLS AND IMPROVED SANITATION ASSISTING IN INCREASING FOOD DISTRIBUTION TO POOR AREAS AND LOW-INCOME FAMILIES PREVENTING DISEASE, THROUGH EDUCATION, INCREASED AVAILABILITY OF MEDICINE AND INCREASED PREVENTATIVE MEDICAL TREATMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPACES
PENNINE 5
20-22 Hawley Street
Sheffield
- Phone:
- 07774128861
- Email:
- info@strive2helpuk.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window