POWER OF THE MIND NETWORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING WOMEN IN PARTICULAR WIDOWED FROM AFRICAN BAME COMMUNITY IN THE NORTHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO THEIR CURRENT CIRCUMSTANCES AND RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND MEET THE NEED OF THESE WOMEN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO INTEGRATE INTO THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 17 November 2020: CIO registration
- POWER OF THE MIND NETWORKS NETWORKS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Shamiso Marawo Miss | Chair | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Racheal Nokutura Reeves | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS MUNDIRWA | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.33k | £45.48k | £70.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.75k | £41.66k | £76.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING WOMEN IN PARTICULAR WIDOWED FROM AFRICAN BAME COMMUNITY IN THE NORTHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO THEIR CURRENT CIRCUMSTANCES AND RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND MEET THE NEED OF THESE WOMEN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO INTEGRATE INTO THE COMMUNITY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
40a The Manor
Billing Garden Village
The Causeway
Great Billing
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 9EX
- Phone:
- 00447496890344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window