FINE FETTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help people with mental health problems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Marks | Chair | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laurence Watson | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cowling | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2025 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2025 | 342 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE AGED OVER 17 YEARS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM DIAGNOSED AND UNDIAGNOSED MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PEER SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT WITH ACCESSING OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTING AND OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES WHICH MAY BE BENEFICIAL TO THEIR RECOVERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 SOUTHWOOD AVENUE
LONDON
N6 5RZ
- Phone:
- 07526376039
- Email:
- finefettlecharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window