THE YORK SPECIAL CARE BABY UNIT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Group is the relief, care and treatment of premature and sick newborn babies in the Special Care Baby Unit at York Hospital, by assisting with the purchase of specialised medical equipment, improving amenities and facilities and supporting the educational and vocational training of staff on the unit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 15 October 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca McClelland | Chair | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Armstrong | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Johnson | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hopkins | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Moore | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristie Atherton | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR Sundeep Sandhu | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA SMITH | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.13k | £34.65k | £37.07k | £25.62k | £38.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.91k | £18.83k | £17.81k | £23.10k | £29.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED 13 JULY 1989 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF, CARE AND TREATMENT OF PREMATURE AND SICK NEWBORN BABIES IN THE SPECIAL CARE BABY UNIT AT YORK HOSPITAL, BY ASSISTING WITH THE PURCHASE OF SPECIALISED MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, IMPROVING AMENITIES AND FACILITIES, PROVIDING EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH TRAVEL COSTS, FOR PARENTS AND SIBLINGS, AND SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF STAFF ON THE UNIT.
Area of benefit
SPECIAL CARE BABY UNIT AT YORK DISTRICT HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Hospital
Wigginton Road
York
YO31 8HE
- Phone:
- 07816272660
- Email:
- info@supportscbuyork.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window