Accounts and annual returns BLAIR BELL RESEARCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 516553
Charity reporting is overdue by 1226 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1226 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1226 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required