IAC-UK

Charity number: 1192578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

International Aid Charity UK was setup to address both the short term and the long term needs of the Ummah (both Muslim and Non-Muslim). The goal is to work abroad that caters to immediate emergency needs but then focus on creating solutions to help beneficiaries become self-sufficient and tackle the long term needs of housing, education (both Islamic and worldly sciences) and employment creation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Cameroon
  • Kenya
  • Malawi
  • Pakistan
  • Turkey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • INTERNATIONAL AID CHARITY UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Imran Khalid Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Imran Farooq Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Dr JUNAID MOHAMMAD AZAM Trustee 31 May 2019
None on record
Mohammad Zaheer Yaqoob Trustee 31 May 2019
THE SUFI HUB
Recently registered
Abadul Haque Trustee 31 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £302.29k £978.96k £624.01k
Total expenditure £276.72k £581.38k £510.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £978.96k £624.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £72.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £580.52k £497.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £855 £13.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.36k £21.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £538.89k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Own use assets N/A £0 £0
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A £677.85k £720.14k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £73.25k £2.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 06 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 06 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 07 September 2024 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 07 September 2024 191 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 02 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kings Court
17 School Road
Hall Green
Birmingham
Phone:
01215170511