REVIVE BAPTIST CHURCH LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Baptist Church based in Leeds. We meet every week, normally in people's houses. We are an Inclusive Church and are LGBTQI friendly. We have a passion for arts, particularly music, politics and justice. We support our members in what they do in life - that is their mission field rather than church -led activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 30 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luisa Bennett | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Naylor Davis | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ian Brentford | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clive Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £38.94k | £17.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £19.91k | £20.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. 3.2 [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHURCH FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 THE TURNWAYS
LEEDS
LS6 3DU
- Phone:
- 07942366360
- Email:
- reviveleeds@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window