UNIVERSAL DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION SOLIDARITY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITABLE PROJECTS FOR THE NEEDY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cameroon
Governance
- 10 November 2020: CIO registration
- UDES UK (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAMID ABOUBAKAR | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALIOU OUSMAN TINGUERE | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ANEES | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.76k | £135.80k | £118.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.36k | £127.64k | £135.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS, WIDOWS, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, CLOTHING, COSTS FOR ATTENDING SCHOOL AND LIVELIHOOD PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; 2. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Bonney Road
LEICESTER
LE3 9NG
- Phone:
- 07541992350
- Email:
- udesuk1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
WWW.UDES.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window