Trustees HAMPSHIRE HISTORY TRUST

Charity number: 1191377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Earwaker Trustee 23 February 2025
None on record
Michael Dymond Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Madeleine Cowell Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Christopher Turner Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Mark Page Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Simon Mildinhall Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Sarah King Trustee 11 January 2024
None on record
Sharon Gray Trustee 11 January 2024
None on record
Paul Geoffrey Blackburn Trustee 16 February 2022
None on record
Richard William John North Trustee 16 February 2022
None on record